Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET ROTTINGDEAN

Charity number: 1138715
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £95.20k £284.81k £211.15k £152.99k £181.02k
Total expenditure £115.05k £152.96k £148.68k £122.18k £112.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A