Accounts and annual returns SHRI GURU NANAK DEV JI GURDWARA

Charity number: 1139016
Charity reporting is up to date (56 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 April 2024 10 April 2025 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 April 2024 10 April 2025 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 April 2023 09 April 2025 421 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 April 2023 09 April 2025 421 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 April 2022 14 June 2024 487 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 April 2022 14 June 2024 487 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 April 2021 14 June 2024 852 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 April 2021 14 June 2024 852 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 13 April 2020 12 May 2021 88 days late
Accounts and TAR 13 April 2020 12 May 2021 88 days late Download Open in new window