SHRI GURU NANAK DEV JI GURDWARA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a Sikh Temple, holding various fundraising events and religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 13 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
17 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 15 November 2010: Standard registration
- 14 October 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 30 June 2015: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
paul lakvinder singh | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
nirvair kaur singh | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
david singh | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
prempal singh Bhatti | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Munmohan Singh Kasbia | Trustee | 26 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANGA SINGH LANDA | Trustee | 26 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 13/04/2020 | 13/04/2021 | 13/04/2022 | 13/04/2023 | 13/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.18k | £29.27k | £40.76k | £51.78k | £54.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.01k | £26.74k | £26.21k | £38.38k | £53.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 13 April 2024 | 10 April 2025 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2024 | 10 April 2025 | 56 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 April 2023 | 09 April 2025 | 421 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2023 | 09 April 2025 | 421 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 April 2022 | 14 June 2024 | 487 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2022 | 14 June 2024 | 487 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 April 2021 | 14 June 2024 | 852 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2021 | 14 June 2024 | 852 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 13 April 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 13 April 2020 | 12 May 2021 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 APRIL 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 17 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION IN NOTTINGHAM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOTTINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gurdwara Guru Nanak Dev Ji
65 Norton Street
NOTTINGHAM
NG7 3HJ
- Phone:
- 01159112792
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window