THE WOODFIELD FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Animal Welfare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Romania
- Scotland
Governance
- 28 January 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW HUGH MCDOUGALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Natalie Rebecca Louise Cawston | Trustee | 12 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANET ELIZABETH MCDOUGALL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.82k | £163.83k | £95.19k | £80.38k | £79.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.21k | £99.70k | £112.47k | £86.26k | £95.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
4. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE IN THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AND FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY) BY: 4.1 PROMOTING HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS FARM AND OTHER ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE; 4.2 PROMOTING THE PRESERVATION OF BREEDS AND BREEDING GROUPS OF DOMESTIC ANIMALS OF IMPORTANCE TO THE PROMOTION OF AGRICULTURE BEING NUMERICALLY SMALL AND HAVING CHARACTERISTICS WORTHY OF PRESERVATION IN THE INTERESTS OF ZOOLOGICAL RESEARCH AND EDUCATION TO ENSURE THE PRESERVATION OF GENES OF SPECIAL OR POTENTIAL VALUE IN HYBRIDISATION AND OTHER WORK; 4.3 ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF ANIMALS AND THE CONSERVATION OF VULNERABLE SPECIES AND RARE ANIMAL BREEDS; OR 4.4 PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
WOODFIELD HOUSE FARM
BISHOP THORNTON
HARROGATE
HG3 3JB
- Phone:
- 01423770401
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window