KINETIKA BLOCO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Kinetika Bloco is a performance group of young musicians, drummers, and dancers all in costume creating a unique new British Carnival sound with a decidedly London edge. Our mission is to engage young people from South London in long term creative activity advancing their education, skills, capacity and enabling them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £222,558 from 8 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Croydon
- Lambeth
- Southwark
Governance
- 31 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIcholai La Barrie | Chair | 04 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Laura Murden | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tikhoze Tileleko Dingani Banda | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yolanda Mercy | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jane Firminger | Trustee | 24 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Ogunbona | Trustee | 05 July 2016 |
|
|||||
Katherine Green | Trustee | 10 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE BOYD | Trustee | 13 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £278.16k | £186.09k | £298.34k | £376.70k | £406.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £267.24k | £149.09k | £261.64k | £338.45k | £375.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £134.78k | £117.66k | £149.81k | £170.69k | £222.56k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JUNE 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 10 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE THOUGH 1 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE 2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR THROUGH EDUCATION IN MUSIC, DANCE AND DESIGN 3 PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES RO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Festival Hall
Southbank Centre
Belvedere Road
London
SE1 8XX
- Phone:
- 07795142535
- Email:
- tamzyn@kinetikabloco.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window