THE REDDITCH MASONIC CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity's purposes (1) For the public benefit to preserve and maintain the structure and fabric of the Masonic Hall, (2) To advance the education of the public in the principles of Freemasonry in particular, but not exclusively, by the establishment of a Masonic Heritage Centre. (3) To make grants and donations to individuals, organisations and other charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 01 February 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR S. J. SUTOR BSC | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Leonard Francis | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Semens | Trustee | 08 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ROBERTS | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HARRIS | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Cardy | Trustee | 02 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Beckett | Trustee | 09 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Buck | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Steve Walker | Trustee | 04 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
KEITH CHILDRESS | Trustee | 25 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALBERT WILLIAM WALKER | Trustee | 25 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROGER MICHAEL BENNETT | Trustee | 25 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MR B. J. HAIR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.05k | £30.10k | £39.30k | £43.49k | £52.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.64k | £26.55k | £39.69k | £35.55k | £42.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 06 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 15 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
(1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PRESERVE AND MAINTAIN THE STRUCTURE AND FABRIC OF THE MASONIC HALL, 21 EASEMORE ROAD, REDDITCH, WORCESTERSHIRE. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE PRINCIPLES OF FREEMASONRY IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A MASONIC HERITAGE CENTRE. (3) TO MAKE GRANTS AND DONATIONS TO INDIVIDUALS, ORGANISATIONS AND OTHER CHARITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SOCIAL EXCLUSION.
Area of benefit
WORCESTERSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Dunstall Close
Webheath
REDDITCH
B97 5UY
- Phone:
- 01527546622
- Email:
- BRIAN.HAIR@BTCONNECT.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window