ISLAM IN BRISTOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Selling books and clothing to the Bristol community. Acting as an information point of the Muslim community in Bristol as well as the rest of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 22 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saad Awad | Chair | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Abdullah Mahamed | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed omar | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
riaz unar | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Aydarus awale | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £78.16k | £74.65k | £63.01k | £97.07k | £91.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.03k | £61.08k | £57.83k | £82.89k | £89.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.84k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 July 2024 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 August 2023 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 August 2023 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 23 August 2021 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 23 August 2021 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 October 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE MUSLIM RELIGION IN THE BRISTOL AREA FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PRODUCING AND /OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE MUSLIM FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE MUSLIM FAITH.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
82 Stapleton Road
BRISTOL
BS5 0PW
- Phone:
- 0117 329 1540
- Email:
- Info@islaminbristol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window