OSCA FOUNDATION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To benefit the residents of Calderdale in particular the areas of Ovenden and surrounding neighbourhood but not exclusively in an effort to advance education preserve and protect good health and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation leisure time occupation with the objective of improving the lives for the residents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Calderdale
Governance
- 07 February 2011: Standard registration
- OSCARENA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN ADRIAN FISHER | Trustee | 27 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN WILLIAM SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.84k | £605.63k | £89.08k | £94.94k | £103.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.43k | £600.79k | £62.36k | £92.52k | £96.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £23.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £460 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £8.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £25.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £571.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £600.79k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 15 June 2024 | 321 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 15 June 2024 | 321 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 17 JANUARY 2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE 21 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
"TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF CALDERDALE, OVENDEN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS
Area of benefit
CALDERDALE, OVENDEN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Forest Cottage Community Centre
Cousin Lane
HALIFAX
West Yorkshire
HX2 8AD
- Phone:
- 01422258350
- Email:
- btr1619@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window