TAMAR DONKEY SANCTUARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The care of animals mainly at this present time 26 donkeys, plus ponies, goats and sheep . All these animals will spend the rest of their lives being cared for by the Tamar Donkey Sanctuary. Education of the public that visit the sanctuary in the care and welfare of animals particularly donkeys. Work experience is provided for College and School students all year round.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cornwall
Governance
- 30 September 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID GIBBONS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MRS CAPELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLYN JANE SANDERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.00k | £24.91k | £17.46k | £38.57k | £20.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.26k | £22.98k | £19.73k | £31.26k | £28.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF CARE, PROTECTION AND/OR PERMANENT SECURITY FOR ANIMALS ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY DONKEYS, WHICH ARE IN NEED BECAUSE OF NEGLECT, SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, OR HOMELESSNESS OR OTHER LIKE CAUSES. TO RAISE THE AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC TO THE WELFARE OF ANIMALS ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY DONKEYS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE CORNWALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
DONKEY PARK
ST. ANN'S CHAPEL
GUNNISLAKE
CORNWALL
PL18 9HW
- Phone:
- 01822834072
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window