FRIENDS OF BOURNEMOUTH WOMEN'S REFUGE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of support and funding for activities not provided by official funding. This includes outings and activities and treats and goods for all those in shelter at the Refuge on both an individual and group basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bournemouth
Governance
- 06 January 2011: Standard registration
- 24 May 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- FOR (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.67k | £5.54k | £2.20k | £826 | £1.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.01k | £2.09k | £2.88k | £941 | £2.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF AND SUPPORT OF PERSONS, WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE IN DANGER OF SUFFERING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE OR ABUSE, THEIR CHILDREN AND DEPENDANTS BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL SUPPORT AND OTHER ASSISTANCE TO THE BOURNEMOUTH WOMEN'S REFUGEO PROMOTE THEIR CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
BOURNEMOUTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window