SHILOH WORSHIP CENTRE APOSTOLIC INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities and christian education to advance the kingdom of God
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 18 March 2011: Standard registration
- 21 October 2015: Funds received from 1141756 EXPRESSION OF WORSHIP
- SHILOH WORSHIP CENTRE CROYDON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERYL GOLDING ST JAMES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LORRAINE BENNETT | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
NEVILLE BURKE | Trustee | 17 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS D GOODRIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.05k | £46.19k | £127.33k | £131.98k | £123.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £164.73k | £89.56k | £166.49k | £176.19k | £163.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 18 February 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 18 February 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 28 June 2022 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 28 June 2022 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 January 2022 | 341 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 January 2022 | 341 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/04/2005
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION 2) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND WHO ARE AGED OR SICK BY THE PROVISION OF CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING, SUPPORT AND ADVICE 3) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 - 69 BENSHAM GROVE
THORNTON HEATH
CR7 8DD
- Phone:
- 0208 771 1565
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window