Trustees HANFIA GHOUSIA MASJID
Charity number: 1142200
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Abdul Sattar Shahid | Chair | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheraz Amin | Trustee | 27 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Muneeb Magre | Trustee | 27 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saleem Husnain | Trustee | 04 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ghulam Sarwar | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Khalil Arshad | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hassan Ghyas | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raja Waseem Ahmed | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.