THE HARLEY STAPLES CANCER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We finance research projects into finding the cause of rare childhood cancers. We also provide holidays at our caravan in Norfolk for any child or young person in the UK battling with cancer to use. Our holiday home is for families to enjoy quality time together, creating memories to cherish forever.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 19 October 2010: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHERINE STAPLES | Chair | 23 August 2010 |
|
|
||||
MR JAMIE STAPLES | Trustee | 23 August 2010 |
|
|
||||
MRS KATE GLOVER | Trustee | 23 August 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.91k | £26.18k | £14.80k | £20.32k | £22.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.17k | £92.49k | £15.34k | £11.68k | £116.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ("THE OBJECTS") SHALL BE THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH AGE ILL-HEALTH DISABILITY FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY PROVIDING HOLIDAYS OR SHORT BREAKS FOR SUCH PERSONS AND THEIR FAMILIES OR OTHERWISE TO BENEFIT SUCH PERSONS AND ANY OTHER PURPOSE RECOGNISED AS A CHARITABLE PURPOSE PURSUANT TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE TIME BEING PURSUANT TO SECTIONS 2 AND 3 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2006 OR ANY REPLACEMENT OR SUCCESSOR LEGISLATION APPLICABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
25-27 STAPLEFORD ROAD
WHISSENDINE
OAKHAM
LE15 7HF
- Phone:
- 07760427758
- Email:
- harleysholidays8@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window