Accounts and annual returns INDIGO KIDS
Charity number: 1139719

Charity reporting is overdue by 1492 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 396 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 396 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 762 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 762 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1127 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1127 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1492 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1492 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window