THE ELDWICK CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Charity is to advance the Christian faith in the Area of Benefit. This includes celebration of public worship, teaching the Christian faith, mission, evangelism & outreach activities, pastoral work, including visiting the sick & bereaved, provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community, and support of other, relevant charities in the UK and overseas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
Governance
- 23 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Huntington | Chair | 06 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carole O'Neill | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rowena Gillow | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher James Wilkinson | Trustee | 31 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Clare Stainsby | Trustee | 29 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Monique Lees | Trustee | 23 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gill Jowett | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Brian James Greenfield | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Margaret Hartley | Trustee | 24 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £207.71k | £116.23k | £115.74k | £119.40k | £133.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £221.56k | £105.56k | £113.60k | £125.63k | £140.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.34k | £8.67k | £5.57k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
18 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 AUGUST 2010 as amended on 06 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
The purpose of the Charity is to advance the Christian faith in the Area of Benefit in accordance with the principles and practices of the Participating Churches. In achieving its purpose, the Charity will engage in a range of activities, either on its own or with others, including (but not restricted to): a) the celebration of public worship; b) the teaching of the Christian faith; c) mission and evangelism; d) pastoral work, including visiting the sick and the bereaved; e) the provision of facilities with a Christian ethos for the local community, including (but not restricted to) the elderly, the young and other groups with special needs; and f) the support of other charities in the UK and overseas.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Eldwick Church
Otley Road
BINGLEY
West Yorkshire
BD16 3EQ
- Phone:
- 01274 442015
- Email:
- office@eldwickchurch.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window