BRITISH CARDIOVASCULAR INTERVENTION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To ensure optimum standards of intervention services in the UK through guidelines, visits and audit. To provide educational meetings, advice and encourage research of high quality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 October 2010: Standard registration
- 20 September 2011: Funds received from 1073454 BRITISH CARDIOVASCULAR INTERVENTION SOCIETY
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rasha Al-Lamee | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Peter O'Kane | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sukhjinder Nijjer | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Colin Berry | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gerald Clesham | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rajesh Kharbanda | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Douglas Fraser | Trustee | 18 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Appleby | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Dan McKenzie | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Peter Curzen | Trustee | 20 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Philip MacCarthy | Trustee | 19 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Douglas Findlay Muir | Trustee | 31 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr PETER LUDMAN | Trustee | 13 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £263.99k | £360.09k | £225.88k | £331.48k | £331.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £379.15k | £323.73k | £145.80k | £386.85k | £386.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 September 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 September 2024 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 02 April 2024 | 247 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 02 April 2024 | 247 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JULY 2010 as amended on 25 Jan 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE EDUCATION OF THOSE INVOLVED IN THE FIELD OF CORONARY ANGIOPLASTY, CARDIAC VALVULOPLASTY AND OTHER INTERVENTIONAL CARDIOVASCULAR PROCEDURES ("THE FIELD"); AND 2. TO PROTECT, PROMOTE AND MAINTAIN THE HEALTH AND SAFETY OF THE COMMUNITY BY CARRYING OUT MEDICAL RESEARCH IN THE FIELD AND HELPING TO MAINTAIN AND RAISE STANDARDS OF CARE IN THE FIELD.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
BCIS Secretariat
Unit 8 Midland Court
Central Park
Lutterworth
Leicestershire
LE17 4PN
- Phone:
- 01455552559
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window