MAMA ASHA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity assist refugees and asylum seekers particularly Somali individuals of all ages throughout United kingdom. Our support includes overcoming communication barriers, helping individuals gain their independence back, advice and guidance on issues including welfare, housing, schools and employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2022
Total income includes £2,347 from 3 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Somalia
Governance
- 10 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Haji abukar Ahmed | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARYAN AHMED GAAB | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.19k | £42.63k | £61.23k | £46.34k | £45.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.39k | £46.03k | £60.05k | £52.51k | £51.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.81k | £7.91k | £2.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 343 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 343 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 04 July 2023 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 04 July 2023 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 164 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 30 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/07/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/03/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20/03/2012
Charitable objects
1) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS OR DISTRESS AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN AFRICA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE, FOOD AND HOUSING PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 2) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN LONDON, TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION, EDUCATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
105 Bridge Court
Stanley Road
Harrow
HA2 8FE
- Phone:
- 07513376760
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window