Accounts and annual returns WOLVERHAMPTON JUDO CLUB

Charity number: 1138810
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 28 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2023 02 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 10 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2021 22 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 22 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 11 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required