ACTION FOR COMMUNITY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of urban or rural regeneration in areas of social and economic deprivation,in Bradford and surrounding areas) by the following means: The relief of financial hardship and unemployment,education and training, financial assistance. The provision of housing for those who are in conditions of need and the improvement of housing in the public sector or in charitable ownership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £330,114 from 2 government contract(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bradford City
Governance
- 14 June 2011: Standard registration
- ACL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roland Graham Clark | Chair | 09 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
HAMAYUN ARSHAD | Trustee | 14 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
RUBY KHALID BHATTI OBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225.95k | £120.37k | £230.17k | £371.15k | £330.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £228.23k | £127.44k | £173.48k | £322.78k | £319.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £120.37k | £230.17k | £371.15k | £330.11k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 18 December 2024 | 141 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 November 2022 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 30 November 2022 | 123 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 08 February 2022 | 193 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 08 February 2022 | 193 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 September 2021 | 424 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 September 2021 | 424 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03/06/2009
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE DISTRICT OF BRADFORD AND SURROUNDING AREAS) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP (B) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT (C) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE (D) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES (E) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS, AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS (F) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING (G) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES (H) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE (I) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES (J) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT (K) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE (L) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME (M) SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CARLISLE BUSINESS CENTRE
60 CARLISLE ROAD
BRADFORD
BD8 8BD
- Phone:
- 01274223203
- Website:
-
actionforcommunity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window