THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. GEORGE MOSSLEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROMOTING CHRISTIAN WORSHIP AND HELP IN THE COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tameside
Governance
- 11 November 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ST. GEORGE'S PCC. MOSSLEY (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DENISE OWEN | Chair | 01 November 2023 |
|
|||||
ANGELA HAZEL AKERS | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rita Brooks | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Berry | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jo Hossle - Standring | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Harry Hossle - Standring | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Lindsey Malkin | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE ELEANOR LUCY MELLOR | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNE DEBORAH MELLOR | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
JULIE ANNE BRUCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE HELY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JACQUELINE RENSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOROTHY DUNN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROL ANN WINTERBOTTOM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.37k | £70.54k | £52.62k | £45.85k | £41.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.50k | £90.81k | £48.84k | £42.56k | £45.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES
Charitable objects
Promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 HADFIELD STREET
OLDHAM
OL8 3EE
- Phone:
- 01616267954
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window