EDGAR'S GIFT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds to provide Gifts/Wishes/Experiences for young adults aged 18 to 30 who have any type of cancer and are being treated at East Midlands Hospitals. Plus those up to 40 years old who have a Sarcoma with treatment at The Leicester Royal Infirmary. We also provide free holidays at our Mablethorpe based Caravan for cancer patients and their families from within the East Midlands area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Coventry City
- Derby City
- Derbyshire
- Leicester City
- Leicestershire
- Northamptonshire
- Nottingham City
- Nottinghamshire
- Rutland
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 11 April 2011: Standard registration
- EDGAR'S GIFT - IMPROVING THE LIVES OF TEENAGERS AND YOUNG ADULTS WITH CANCER IN LEICESTER AND LEICESTERSHIRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Joseph Clarke | Chair | 07 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Parkin | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Howard Parkin | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Molly Cullen | Trustee | 29 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Knight | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jordan Handford | Trustee | 09 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lydia Mahala Edkins | Trustee | 29 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JULIE BRADMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NEIL BRADMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/04/2020 | 29/04/2021 | 29/04/2022 | 29/04/2023 | 29/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.82k | £13.94k | £37.18k | £30.40k | £42.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.84k | £12.35k | £9.90k | £45.87k | £21.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 April 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 April 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 April 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2022 | 12 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 07/04/2011 as amended on 09 Jun 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN LEICESTERSHIRE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND SERVICES AND BY SUPPORTING OTHER CHARITIES WHICH ASSIST YOUNG CANCER SUFFERERS
Contact information
- Address:
-
31A Salisbury Avenue
Croft
LEICESTER
LE9 3EJ
- Phone:
- 07875712478
- Email:
- NEIL@EDGARSGIFT.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window