SHEPHERDS DENE

Charity number: 1138224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the Christian religion by the provision of a house of retreat, primarily but not exclusively for members of the Church of England who are resident in the Dioceses of Newcastle and Durham, which may also be used for any other charitable purpose which in the opinion of the trustee will maintain and strengthen the religious and educational life of its users.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £338,924
Total expenditure: £346,630

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham
  • Gateshead
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City
  • North Tyneside
  • Northumberland
  • South Tyneside
  • Sunderland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 May 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Venerable Rachel Astrid Wood Trustee 20 December 2023
THE REVEREND DOCTOR THOMLINSON'S LIBRARY AND THE ENDOWNMENT OF WALTER BLACKETT
Received: On time
ISABEL WRIGHTSON
Received: On time
THE ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY OF WILLIAM MOULTON
Received: On time
THE STANLEY WALTON BROWN MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
Rev Barbara Anne Hilton Trustee 13 September 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, BYERS GREEN, IN THE DIOCESE OF DURHAM
Recently registered
Venerable Richard Lee Simpson Trustee 20 September 2021
ST LUKE'S HEALTHCARE FOR THE CLERGY
Received: On time
THE DURHAM LESOTHO DIOCESAN LINK
Received: On time
Elisabeth Flora Rowark Trustee 14 June 2017
None on record
Alistair Jenkins Trustee 01 December 2016
None on record
Rev John McManners Trustee 09 September 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £379.69k £189.70k £256.21k £302.81k £338.92k
Total expenditure £374.94k £239.52k £233.16k £323.28k £346.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £74.05k £55.07k £9.00k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 12 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 12 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 30 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 December 2020 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 December 2020 44 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 17/05/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROVISION OF A HOUSE OF RETREAT, PRIMARILY BUT NO EXCLUSIVELY FOR MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND WHO ARE RESIDENT IN THE DIOCESES OF NEWCASTLE AND DURHAM, WHICH MAY ALSO BE USED FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEE WILL MAINTAIN AND STRENGTHEN THE RELIGIOUS AND EDUCATIONAL LIFE OF ITS USERS.
Area of benefit
DIOCESES OF DURHAM AND NEWCASTLE
Registration history
  • 19 May 1988 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Shepherds Dene
Slaley Road
Riding Mill
Northumberland
NE44 6AF
Phone:
01434682212