BLOOM FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees meet the trust's objectives by making grants to other organisations in furtherance of those objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 03 February 2011: Standard registration
- 22 June 2018: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 22 June 2018: Funds transferred to 1166112 THE BLOOM FOUNDATION
- BLOOM FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- TONY BLOOM CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.92m | £2.89m | £3.15m | £4.26m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.87m | £2.75m | £1.89m | £5.50m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.91m | £2.88m | £3.14m | £4.25m | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £9.07k | £1.56k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £247 | £1.21k | £1.55k | £8.16k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.86m | £2.74m | £1.87m | £5.49m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.32k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.20k | £6.60k | £6.84k | £143.67k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.86m | £0 | £0 | £5.34m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £13.77k | £16.32k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2017 | 25 May 2018 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | 28 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | 28 April 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 11 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 11 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 20 February 2015 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 12 December 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 02/02/2011 AS AMENDED ON 04/04/2013
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF DISABLED AND TERMINALLY ILL CHILDREN AND SOLDIERS DISABLED OR MADE ILL BY CONFLICT. SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window