ACTON COMMUNITY FORUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing community resource centres Support for residents and voluntary organisations Organising resident events Operating as a key delivery partner in local initiatives and partnerships Working closely with residents and delivering commissioned projects Delivering training Building the capacity of networks, forums and partnerships Serving as a key partner on local decision making bodies
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ealing
Governance
- 01 February 2011: Standard registration
- 09 September 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 01 October 2013: Re-registered
- 03 June 2021: Removed (Does not operate)
- ACF (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £378.95k | £312.86k | £284.80k | £230.61k | £129.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £365.64k | £314.58k | £270.18k | £228.76k | £179.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £20.40k | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £28.48k | £156.21k | £171.63k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 MAY 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF ACTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA: = TO PROVIDE RELIEF FROM SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE. = TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF ITS RESIDENTS OF ALL AGES; AND IN PARTICULAR = TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF ACTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. = TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OR SECTIONS OF THE PUBLIC (INCLUDING INDIVIDUAL COMMUNITIES DEFINED BY THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS IN WHICH THEY LIVE OR WORK OR THEIR ETHNIC ORIGINS) AS THE ORGANISATION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window