KING'S JUNIOR VOICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
King's Junior Voices is a free, non-auditioned, Saturday community choir for 90 Cambridge children aged 7-13, with an extension group of 13-17 yr olds. Most of the children come from state schools. The choir has a conductor, an accompanist, an assistant teacher and an administrator. We perform at at least two concerts per year in prestigious local venues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 12 November 2010: Standard registration
- 04 January 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 04 January 2023: Funds transferred to 1198653 KJV COMMUNITY CHILDREN'S CHOIR CHARITABLE INCORPOR...
- KJV (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.88k | £18.84k | £17.61k | £16.12k | £20.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.37k | £18.92k | £17.36k | £15.57k | £19.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 11 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS. 2. TO FURTHER ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PUPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT, BUT IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window