PETERBOROUGH SINGS!
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Choir's primary activities are to advance, improve, develop and maintain public education in, and appreciation of, the art and science of music in all its aspects but in particular choral music, by any means the trustees see fit, including through the presentation of public concerts and recitals, and social functions to advance the cohesion of Peterborough Sings!.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2017
Total income includes £34,700 from government contract(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 06 January 2011: Standard registration
- 14 March 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- PMVC (Working name)
- PETERBOROUGH MALE VOICE CHOIR (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2013 | 31/05/2014 | 31/05/2015 | 31/05/2016 | 31/05/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £143.83k | £110.73k | £230.47k | £206.58k | £238.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £141.04k | £54.88k | £248.44k | £218.57k | £269.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £46.22k | £34.70k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £4.00k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2017 | 05 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2017 | 05 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2016 | 15 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2016 | 15 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2015 | 11 February 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 May 2015
(These accounts |
11 February 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 May 2014 | 27 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2014 | 23 March 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/05/2010 AS AMENDED ON 31/07/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BUT IN PARTICULAR CHORAL MUSIC, BY ANY MEANS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND RECITALS, AND SOCIAL FUNCTIONS TO ADVANCE THE COHESION OF 'PETERBOROUGH SINGS!' (PS); AND TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT, INCLUDING THROUGH THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window