REVELATION COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Church with associated ministries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Simpson | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Valerio | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Benson | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Alice Bradberry | Trustee | 25 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTONIA ELIZABETH BRINDED | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Jacqueline Anne Stone | Trustee | 11 September 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £652.39k | £322.49k | £209.56k | £267.85k | £282.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £398.33k | £366.58k | £316.90k | £376.10k | £329.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £56.78k | £24.90k | £5.06k | £10.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £462.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £11.54k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £176.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.22k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £398.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.99k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS IN THE SCHEDULE TO THE ARTICLES HERETO ATTACHED IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF WEST SUSSEX, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO FURTHER CHRISTIAN EDUCATION IN SUCH PARTS OF WEST SUSSEX, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, TRAINING IN LIFE SKILLS AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF WEST SUSSEX, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (D) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
104 The Hornet
CHICHESTER
PO19 7JR
- Phone:
- 01243531898
- Email:
- mail@revelation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window