BGS Transfusion

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness and the advancement of education by providing blood transfusion education in particular by the provision of an extended scientific conference, affordable to the NHS, located in the South of England, primarily aimed at hospital based transfusion scientists and related staff.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 February 2011: Standard registration
- BLOOD GROUP SEROLOGY READING (Working name)
- BGS READING (Previous name)
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BEN HOLMES | Chair | 01 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Chelsea Louise Ridsdale | Trustee | 28 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Matthew James Hazell | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Douglas | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Charles Haggas | Trustee | 05 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Martin Maley | Trustee | 15 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANE MURPHY | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANN ROSEMARY HALFORD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.95k | £4.81k | £27.97k | £6.41k | £49.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.09k | £822 | £37.81k | £8.55k | £40.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 May 2023 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 May 2023 | 17 days late | |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 01 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 9 FEBRUARY 2011 as amended on 12 Mar 2019 as amended on 05 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (`THE OBJECTS'): THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROVIDING BLOOD TRANSFUSION EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF AN EXTENDED SCIENTIFIC CONFERENCE, AFFORDABLE TO THE NHS, LOCATED IN THE SOUTH OF ENGLAND, PRIMARILY AIMED AT HOSPITAL BASED TRANSFUSION SCIENTISTS AND RELATED STAFF.
Area of benefit
SOUTH OF ENGLAND,
Contact information
- Address:
-
W L O S
PO Box 3472
WOKINGHAM
RG40 9AL
- Phone:
- 01189785125
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window