THE ENTHEOS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Entheos Trust consists of a team committed to help churches engage with their communities. We assist churches and individuals as they seek to establish or re-establish themselves at the very heart of their communities. This is achieved by organising regional day conferences, bespoke mentoring sessions and consultancies with individual churches and organisations and signposting resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 January 2011: Standard registration
- 09 February 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 23 April 2015: Re-registered
- ENTHEOS; ENTHEOS MINISTRIES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN ROGER SULLY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev PETER PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.37k | £1.91k | £671 | £670 | £865 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.57k | £1.32k | £1.20k | £1.46k | £270 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 September 2024 | 73 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2023 | 344 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY EDUCATING, EQUIP NG AND ENVISIONING UK CHURCHES, ORGANISATIONS, INSTITUTIONS AND EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS TO PRACTICALLY COMMUNICATE AND DEMONSTRATE THE TENETS OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH HOLISTIC SERVICE TO THOSE OF ALL FAITHS AND NONE. (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THOSE IN LEADERSHIP POSITIONS IN UK CHURCHES, ORGANISATIONS. INSTITUTIONS AND EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS, BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION IN LEADERSHIP SKILLS TO ENABLE THEM TO LEAD OTHERS TO CONTRIBUTE TO COMMUNITY COHESION AND BETTER EQUIP THEM TO IDENTIFY AND MEET THE NEEDS OF THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED WITHIN THEIR COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 THE GREEN
RADYR
CARDIFF
CF15 8BR
- Phone:
- 02920310171
- Email:
- mail@theentheostrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window