HOUSE OF BREAD MINISTRIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
3 field trips have taken place and each time a trip was organised and gifts were given to each person. A Christmas party took place for 40 children. There was a swimming trip for 40 children. In visits to peoples homes gifts of money, toiletries, toys and clothes were left with families. Ongoing monthly financial support is given to 14 families. A 15 year old is supported in her education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 August 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 27 January 2011: Standard registration
- 09 September 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/08/2011 | 04/08/2012 | 04/08/2013 | 04/08/2014 | 04/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.92k | £4.77k | £2.91k | £2.65k | £1.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.16k | £4.57k | £2.50k | £4.50k | £3.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 August 2015 | 08 September 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 August 2014 | 04 March 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 August 2013 | 25 June 2014 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 August 2012 | 04 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 August 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND NEED AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN BETHLEHEM, BELT JALA AND BEIT SAHOUR, BY: A) PROVIDING INDIVIDUALS AND/OR COMMUNITIES WITH GOODS AND SERVICES WHICH THEY WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE ABLE TO AFFORD DUE TO A LACK OF MEANS; B) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE. 2) THE FURTHERANCE OF SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
BETHLEHEM, BELT JALA AND BEIT SAHOUR,
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window