The Royal Lancers & Nottinghamshire Yeomanry Museum Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a free to enter Museum Gallery which showcases the military and social history of The Royal Lancers and Nottinghamshire's Cavalry from 1689 to the present day. Provision for family research and an on site educational research facility. Preservation and conservation of artefacts and archival material.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Leicestershire
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 04 November 2010: Standard registration
- THE QUEEN'S ROYAL LANCERS AND NOTTINGHAMSHIRE YEOMANRY MUSEUM LIMITED (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Roland Pritchard | Chair | 13 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Martin Richard Daly | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Major Justin Alexander Charlton-Jones | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Major Rupert Dorien Marsh | Trustee | 02 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
CAPTAIN JOHN MICHAEL HOLTBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD JOHN BOORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Timothy Stewart Richmond | Trustee |
|
||||||
IAN OLDERSHAW | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.94k | £9.30k | £15.78k | £19.22k | £21.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.81k | £36.11k | £25.79k | £28.92k | £31.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 February 2024 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 JULY 2010 as amended on 10 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE QUEEN'S ROYAL LANCERS REGIMENTAL MUSEUM TRUST (A CHARITY REGISTERED IN ENGLAND AND WALES UNDER CHARITY NO. 1037202), THE CHARITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SHERWOOD RANGERS YEOMANRY (A CHARITY REGISTERED IN ENGLAND AND WALES UNDER CHARITY NO. 1069782) AND THE SOUTH NOTTS HUSSARS MUSEUM AND SILVER TRUST (A CHARITY REGISTERED IN ENGLAND AND WALES UNDER CHARITY NO 515437) (TOGETHER THE "REGIMENTS") IN THE HISTORY AND MILITARY ACCOMPLISHMENTS OF THE REGIMENTS BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE BY PUBLIC EXHIBITION OF THE UNIFORMS, MEDALS, PICTURES, BOOKS, MANUSCRIPTS, MAPS, DOCUMENTS AND OTHER SIMILAR OR ASSOCIATED ARTICLES CONNECTED WITH THE REGIMENTS AND BELONGING TO THE CHARITY OR ON LOAN THERETO ("THE COLLECTION") IN A MUSEUM OR MUSEUMS OR SUCH OTHER PUBLIC PLACE AS THE DIRECTORS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE AND TO CONSERVE, RESTORE, REPAIR, RECONSTRUCT AND PRESERVE THE OBJECTS CONTAINED WITHIN THE COLLECTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Lancers & Nottinghamshire Yeomanry Museum
Thoresby
NEWARK
Nottinghamshire
NG22 9EP
- Phone:
- 01623824222
- Email:
- curator@rlnymuseum.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window