THE DONALD ANDERSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
continues to support charities connected to the support of the Homless and Classical Music
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 November 2010: Standard registration
- 23 June 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2011 | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.87k | £11.00k | £12.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £203.23k | £117.00k | £70.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 04 February 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 21 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2011 | 30 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 28 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY ALLEVIATING HOMELESSNESS AND THE CONSEQUENCES OF HOMELESSNESS; AND 2) TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE OR CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window