PENTECOSTAL MISSIONARY CHURCH OF CHRIST (4TH WATCH)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement of the Christian Faith worldwide in accordance with the doctrines set out in the statement of faith. Relief of poverty, sickness and distress by the provision of such things as financial support, medical missions, rehab centres, food, befriending service, advise, scholarships, mentoring and counselling.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Bridgend
- Liverpool City
- Manchester City
- Newport City
- Reading
- Slough
- Staffordshire
- Throughout London
- Abu Dhabi
- Australia
- Belgium
- Cyprus
- Dubai
- France
- Germany
- Greece
- Hong Kong
- India
- Ireland
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Japan
- Kenya
- Macau
- Madagascar
- Malta
- Mauritius
- Morocco
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Norway
- Philippines
- Qatar
- Scotland
- Singapore
- Spain
- Switzerland
- Thailand
- United Arab Emirates
- Vietnam
Governance
- 14 October 2010: Standard registration
- PMCC 4TH WATCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHERRY SOTERO | Trustee | 27 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
GLENDA ROBLES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RHANDY DANCEL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMPARO AGBULOS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.46k | £205.82k | £185.85k | £230.70k | £341.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £133.66k | £158.92k | £140.64k | £180.06k | £328.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 October 2022
(These accounts |
25 October 2023 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 01 September 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 02 November 2020 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 25 November 2020 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 OCTOBER 2006
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE; B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH THINGS AS FINANCIAL SUPPORT, MEDICAL MISSIONS, REHAB CENTRES, FOOD, BEFRIENDING SERVICE, ADVICE, SCHOLARSHIPS, MENTORING AND COUNSELLING; C) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES AS AFORESAID BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
126 ST. PAULS AVENUE
SLOUGH
SL2 5ER
- Phone:
- 01753574254
- Email:
- pmcc4thwatch@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window