HANDSWORTH ASSOCIATION OF SCHOOLS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote,develop and advance home/school/community partnership activities which meet the educational,social,health,recreational,cultural,linguistic and safety needs in the member schools of the Handsworth Association and their communities. To develop a collaborative approach to the Association's plan for school improvement and development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £8,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Sandwell
Governance
- 10 May 2011: Standard registration
- HAS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Louise Smith | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
SHAMALA ANTONIO | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
OLABIMPE ODUBANJO | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
PARVEEN TALWAR | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
IVORA FERREIRA-BEAN | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
TAYLOR ALISON | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
BOGUSIA MATUSIAK-VARLEY | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD EDMEAD | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD ANTHONY WRIGHT | Trustee | 19 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.41k | £112.44k | £321.39k | £392.44k | £377.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.85k | £106.85k | £245.50k | £326.65k | £370.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £34.05k | £25.00k | £90.00k | £8.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ADOPTED 01/02/1999 AS AMENDED ON 01/04/2011
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF HANDSWORTH AND SURROUNDING AREA OF NORTH WEST BIRMINGHAM AS THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE SEES FIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (A) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND FAMILIES ACROSS THE MEMBER SCHOOLS; BY SEEKING SCHOOL IMPROVEMENT AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN ENVIRONMENTAL EDUCATION, HEALTHY LIFESTYLES AND THE SAFETY OF YOUNG PEOPLE; (C) PROMOTING GOOD CITIZENSHIP, COMMUNITY COHESION AND EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES; (D) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATIONS (INCLUDING SPORTS) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE AIM OF IMPROVING THE INHABITANTS’ CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (E) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE DEVELOP THEIR CAPACITIES, SKILLS AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY TO SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE ADULTS; AND (F) THROUGH EDUCATION - PROMOTING ADULT EDUCATION AND FAMILY LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES; PROMOTING AND ENHANCING THE IMPORTANCE OF EDUCATION AND THE IMPORTANCE OF THE ECONOMIC WELL BEING OF THE FAMILY.
Area of benefit
HANDSWORTH AND SURROUNDING AREA OF NORTH WEST BIRMINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Handsworth Association of Schools
Welford Road
BIRMINGHAM
B20 2BL
- Phone:
- 0121 464 7770
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window