Financial history HATFIELD PEVEREL FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1140160
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £103.93k £75.28k £86.15k £100.11k £109.16k
Total expenditure £82.77k £92.73k £118.30k £112.86k £122.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.65k £12.16k