HATFIELD PEVEREL FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The club continues to provide opportunities for football participation and seek to increase new members.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £12,159 from 3 government grant(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 02 February 2011: Standard registration
- HPFC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Howard | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Webb | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.93k | £75.28k | £86.15k | £100.11k | £109.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.77k | £92.73k | £118.30k | £112.86k | £122.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.65k | £12.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 February 2024 | 302 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 02 March 2023 | 306 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 02 March 2023 | 306 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 JUNE 2010 AS AMENDED 18 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
134 Constance Close
WITHAM
Essex
CM8 1XZ
- Phone:
- 07778408051
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window