HOPE COMMUNITY PROJECT WOLVERHAMPTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To reach out and support the most vulnerable and isolated people in the community Door knocking,outreach Support at home ESOL support for speakers of other languages, emotional, practical support Visiting support for older people at home, lunch club, exercise classes, friendship group, Children and Youth groups, issue based work, 1:1 key work Women's group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 17 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saber Ghafoor | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Penman | Trustee | 17 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Susan Watters | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SISTER MARGARET WALSH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £188.33k | £164.67k | £69.33k | £157.44k | £255.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.63k | £161.49k | £134.26k | £154.99k | £245.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 03 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
4.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED SPECIFICALLY TO: 4.1.1 RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED BY REASONS OF YOUTH, AGE, DISABILITY, ILL-HEALTH, OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE AND SPECIFICALLY BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE WIDER OBJECTS, TO PROVIDE COMMUNITY OUTREACH SUPPORT FOR THE VULNERABLE AND ISOLATED OF WOLVERHAMPTON AND THE HEATH TOWN AREA OF WOLVERHAMPTON. 4.1.2 PREVENT AND RELIEVE POVERTY GENERALLY AND SPECIFICALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF TAILORED SUPPORT FOR INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE IN NEED OR VULNERABLE DUE TO FINANCIAL OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE. 4.1.3 ADVANCE CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT TO RELIEVE ANY NEED WHICH IS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES OF THOSE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED. 4.1.4. PROVIDE SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES FOR OLDER PEOPLE. 4.1.5. PROVISION OF A WIDE VARIETY OF SUPPORT AND ACTIVITES FOR CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
WOLVERHAMPTON AND THE HEATH TOWN AREA OF WOLVERHAMPTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 Ling House
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV10 0HH
- Phone:
- 01902556645
- Email:
- enquiries@hope-cp.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window