HARTLEPOOL COASTAL SURVEILLANCE STATION LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Keep a visual watchon the coastal and inshore areas in the Hartlepool Bay and shoreline. Monitor the International distress chanel on VHF Ch 16, Keep a radarwatch when the visibility is poor. Co-operate with HM Coastguard and all other search and rescue services when required. Monitor and record the local weather and give reports when requested. Keep a watch on local wildlife.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hartlepool
Governance
- 01 April 2011: Standard registration
- 09 September 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- HARTLEPOOL COASTWATCH (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.06k | £2.21k | £9.57k | £701 | £4.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.69k | £2.98k | £3.51k | £3.96k | £2.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 07 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 29 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/07/2010 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24/01/2011
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO ASSIST HER MAJESTY'S COASTGUARD AND OTHER RESCUE BODIES INCLUDING LOCAL LIFE GUARDS, THE LOCAL COUNCIL AND THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL IN THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF LIFE IN THE INSHORE WATERS AND BEACHES ALONG THE HARTLEPOOL AND TEES BAY AREA OF THE COAST
Area of benefit
HARTLEPOOL AND TEES BAY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window