Financial history BRITISH WHEEL OF YOGA QUALIFICATIONS

Charity number: 1140717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £21.18k £369.42k £22.19k £14.85k £20.20k
Total expenditure £15.42k £360.26k £18.49k £20.11k £21.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A