EMERGE VICTIMS TO SURVIVORS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support service for adult survivors of childhood sexual abuse,offering face-to-face, group and helpline support. We also offer advice for family members and partners and other healthcare professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 03 June 2011: Standard registration
- EMERGE FROM VICTIM TO SURVIVOR (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amanda Nicklin | Chair | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Edward Nicklin | Trustee | 09 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Denise Susan Cottam | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor Robinson | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2019 | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | 01/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.50k | £303 | £546 | £320 | £42 | |
|
Total expenditure | £35 | £83 | £275 | £3.12k | £817 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | 19 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 16 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 November 2019 | 10 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/10/2010
Charitable objects
OBJECTS A) FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF ANY PERSON WITHIN STAFFORD, CANNOCK AND ITS ENVIRONS WHO HAVE BEEN SUBJECT TO ANY DEGREE OF SEXUAL ABUSE, COERCIAN OR HARASSMENT, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING, ASSISTANCE AND OTHER SUPPORT SERVICES. B) TO PROMOTE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN STAFFORD,CANNOCK AND ITS ENVIRONS BY RAISING AWARENESS IN MATTERS RELATING TO SEXUAL VIOLENCE AND ITS IMPACT ON INDIVIDUALS AND THE COMMUNITY IN RESPECT OF PSYCHOLOGICAL, SOCIAL, ECONOMIC AND CULTURAL CONSIDERATIONS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Room 42 Foundation House
St George's Hospital
Corporation Street
Stafford
ST16 3AG
- Phone:
- 01785 225991
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window