Financial history Canvas

Charity number: 1138522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £130.46k £88.07k £129.48k £122.98k £140.41k
Total expenditure £112.57k £86.05k £126.76k £133.80k £139.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A