ACCRINGTON STANLEY FOOTBALL IN THE COMMUNITY TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROMOTION OF SPORTS ENGAGEMENT AND EDUCATION BY USING FOOTBALL AS A VEHICLE FOR CHANGE, PROMOTING COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION, PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR SPORT, AND ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income:
£1,241,843
Donations and legacies | £165.22k | |
Charitable activities | £997.89k | |
Other trading activities | £72.35k | |
Investments | £5.40k | |
Other | £988 |
Total expenditure:
£1,098,656
Raising funds | £23.27k | |
Charitable activities | £1.08m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £23.27k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.08m | |
Retained for future use | £143.19k |
People

40 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
74 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 30 December 2010: Previously excepted registration
- ACCRINGTON STANLEY COMMUNITY TRUST (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Warren Eastham | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Peter Leaver | Trustee | 30 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Albert Knagg | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Edward Houseman | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Carl Ellwood | Trustee | 20 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jonathan Leatham | Trustee | 06 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS DAVID O'NEILL | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
John David McGregor | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
PURVES ALI | Trustee | 14 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ELLWOOD | Trustee | 22 February 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.65m | £938.78k | £1.29m | £1.61m | £1.24m | |
|
Total expenditure | £524.18k | £572.94k | £927.89k | £989.43k | £1.10m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £39.32k | £105.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.06m | £260.20k | £205.50k | £710.54k | £165.22k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £16.82k | £24.57k | £47.79k | £31.56k | £72.35k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £576.54k | £654.01k | £1.04m | £868.77k | £997.89k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £550 | £0 | £148 | £124 | £5.40k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £988 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £31.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £524.18k | £569.63k | £917.29k | £985.70k | £1.08m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £3.31k | £10.60k | £3.73k | £23.27k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.29k | £11.70k | £14.85k | £19.09k | £17.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.09m | £2.18m | £2.24m | £3.39m | £3.42m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £244.15k | £391.08k | £704.31k | £196.88k | £348.08k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £315.68k | £186.66k | £201.14k | £217.37k | £256.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 08 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 MAY 2017 as amended on 23 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS FORMED SHALL BE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF ACCRINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY: (I) TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH ("FACILITIES" IN THIS CLAUSE MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); (II) TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN LANCASHIRE BY COACHING IN AND PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE GAME OF FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTING ACTIVITIES SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY; (III) TO ADVANCE AND ASSIST IN ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC, WITH A PARTICULAR FOCUS ON THAT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE ATTENDING SCHOOLS IN THE LANCASHIRE AREA BY THE PROVISION AT VENUES SELECTED OR APPROVED BY THE CHARITY OF MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES AND ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS FOR DISTRIBUTION TO SUCH CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE; (IV) TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE GAME OF FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTING ACTIVITIES, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (V) TO ADVANCE RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY AND EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE BY ARRANGING ACTIVITIES (INCLUDING ACTIVITIES CONNECTED WITH THE GAME OF FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTING ACTIVITIES) TO ENCOURAGE SHARED EXPERIENCES AND INTERESTS WITHOUT REFERENCE TO RACE, RELIGION, BELIEF, SEX, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, ETHNIC OR NATIONAL ORIGIN OR SOCIAL BACKGROUND. (VI) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHARITY LAW
Area of benefit
ACCRINGTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stanley Sports Hub
Thorneyholme Road
Accrington
Lancashire
BB5 6BD
- Phone:
- 01254475013
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window