INNOCENCE IN DANGER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fund raising Sourcing a building to provide therapies/facilities Sourcing an office Sourcing volunteers Building Board + Team of employees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Canada
- Colombia
- France
- Germany
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 18 November 2010: Standard registration
- 26 March 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- IID (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2011 | |
---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2011 | 30 October 2012 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN IN THE UNITED KINGDOM WHO ARE UNDERPRIVILEGED OR OTHERWISE IN NEED IN SOME MANNER OR FORM, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: (1) THE PROVISION OF HOLIDAY OR RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION; (2) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL OR SOCIAL FACILITIES; (3) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE FOR THE PSYCHOLOGICAL WELL BEING OF SUCH CHILDREN; (4) THE PROVISION OF AMENITIES OR FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH CHILDREN; (5) THE PROMOTION OF THE HEALTH OF SUCH CHILDREN; (6) TO CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE CARE, EDUCATION AND RECREATION OF SUCH CHILDREN AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; (7) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PERSONS PROVIDING CARE TO SUCH CHILDREN; AND (8) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND THE RELEVANT PROFESSIONS WITH REGARD TO CHILD ABUSE, INCLUDING THE EMOTIONAL AND PSYCHOLOGICAL CONSEQUENCES RESULTING FROM ANY FORM OF ABUSE OR NEGLECT IN CHILDHOOD.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window