BALMORAL COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Association runs the Balmoral Centre for the benefit of one of the most disadvantaged wards in the UK. It is the only community facility, and promotes community cohesion in an area of intense multicultural diversity. It runs projects to help disadvantaged, vulnerable people play a fuller role in the community through improved life choices and chances, and social and community involvement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Southend-on-sea
Governance
- 16 November 2010: Standard registration
- BALMORAL CENTRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHANIE ROSE STAMP MBIVR | Chair |
|
|
|||||||
GRAHAM REEDER | Trustee | 02 August 2012 |
|
|||||||
GEOFFREY BRENNAN | Trustee | 31 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||
GAYLA DENISE ROWLING | Trustee | 31 July 2012 |
|
|
||||||
PETER JAMES RUSHMAN FMAAT AFA | Trustee | 30 November 2011 |
|
|
||||||
VICTOR THOMAS ANDREWS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.36k | £7.18k | £22.72k | £24.64k | £22.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.58k | £11.28k | £21.28k | £24.57k | £21.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 01 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
TO (A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA AND SOUTHEND-ON-SEA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT, OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; (C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
WESTCLIFF-ON-SEA AND SOUTHEND-ON-SEA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Balmoral Community Centre
Salisbury Avenue
Westcliff-on-Sea
Essex
SS0 7AU
- Phone:
- 01702351030
- Email:
- office@balmoralcentre.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window