Accounts and annual returns NEWCASTLE CHINESE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1139735
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 8 days
Annual return 01 July 2023 26 June 2024 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2023 26 June 2024 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 July 2022 30 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2022 30 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 July 2021 24 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2021 24 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 July 2020 24 June 2021 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 July 2020 12 July 2021 72 days late Download Open in new window