THE RAMSGATE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The purpose of the Society is to protect and improve the quality of life of the citizens of Ramsgate, having particular regard to the quality of the built and natural environment, its civic and open spaces, the history and heritage of the town, and the encouragement of civic pride and active citizenship.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,750 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kent
Governance
- 03 November 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN VINCENT WALKER | Chair | 20 May 2015 |
|
|||||||||
Sophie Clissold-Lesser Vice Chair | Trustee | 04 September 2024 |
|
|||||||||
David Walter Lister | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Susan May Ford | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Paul Douglas Shearer | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Philip Alan Shotton | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Rob Warren | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Terry Prue | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Michael Stephen Ashley | Trustee | 03 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.32k | £19.40k | £73.12k | £16.36k | £18.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.53k | £10.16k | £27.06k | £29.12k | £22.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £9.00k | N/A | N/A | £8.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 April 2024 | 525 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ENCOURAGE HIGH STANDARDS OF ARCHITECTURE AND TOWN PLANNING IN RAMSGATE. TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN, AND CARE FOR, THE BEAUTY, HISTORY AND CHARACTER OF THE TOWN AND ITS SURROUNDINGS TO ENCOURAGE THE PRESERVATION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF GENERAL PUBLIC AMENITY OR HISTORIC INTEREST TO PURSUE THESE ENDS BY MEANS OF MEETINGS, EXHIBITIONS, LECTURES, PUBLICATIONS, OTHER FORMS OF INSTRUCTION AND PUBLICITY, AND PROMOTION OF SCHEMES OF A CHARITABLE NATURE
Area of benefit
RAMSGATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ramsgate Town Council
Custom House
Harbour Parade
RAMSGATE
Kent
CT11 8LP
- Phone:
- 07971191237
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window