PRINCE PHILIP HOSPITAL BREAST CARE UNIT FUND (PPH BCU FUND)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This is a breast cancer charity for the patients attending The Prince Philip Hospital, Llanelli, Withybush Hospital, Haverfordwest and Bronglais Hospital, Aberystwyth. We provide funds for those in hardship as a consequence of treatment for Breast Cancer. We fund research into breast disease. We provide equipment and facilities for the Breast Clinics.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- City Of Swansea
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 22 February 2011: Standard registration
- PPH BCU FUND (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saira Khawaja | Chair | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Nelson | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ashley Williams | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Esther Davies | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carol Diane Owen | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMON DAVID HENRY HOLT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHERINE BAILEY THOMAS BA MSC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 01/09/2022 | 01/09/2023 | 01/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.18k | £43.19k | £79.53k | £169.61k | £81.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.14k | £45.71k | £40.52k | £72.44k | £75.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 September 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2020 | 02 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 OCTOBER 2010
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE EQUIPMENT, SERVICES, FITTINGS AND FURNISHINGS TO ENHANCE THE CARE OF THE PATIENTS OF THE PRINCE PHILIP HOSPITAL BREAST CARE UNIT AS NOT OTHERWISE PROVIDED BY THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE. 2. TO ENCOURAGE, SUPPORT, FACILITATE AND ADVANCE HIGH QUALITY RESEARCH AND UNDERSTANDING OF BREAST DISEASE. THIS WILL INCLUDE FUNDING REASONABLE EXPENSES INCURRED BY STAFF OR PATIENTS OF THE PRINCE PHILIP HOSPITAL BREAST CARE UNIT REQUESTING TO ATTEND IMPORTANT ACADEMIC, RESEARCH OR POLICY MEETINGS IN THE UK OR ABROAD, WHERE NOT OTHERWISE PAID FOR BY THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE. 3. TO SUPPORT FINANCIALLY ANY OF THE PATIENTS OF THE PRINCE PHILIP HOSPITAL BREAST CARE UNIT WHO FIND THEMSELVES SEVERELY DISADVANTAGED BY THE CIRCUMSTANCES OF THEIR BREAST DISEASE. SUPPORT ALSO MAY BE OFFERED TO THEIR FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
THE PRINCE PHILIP HOSPITAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PRINCE PHILIP HOSPITAL
BRYNGWYN MAWR
DAFEN
LLANELLI
SA14 8QF
- Phone:
- 01554783386
- Email:
- saira.khawaja@wales.nhs.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window