Financial history ONE 17 DESIGN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1139468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £19.54k £17.00k £21.07k £22.89k £22.50k
Total expenditure £19.16k £15.78k £22.46k £23.16k £22.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A