ONE 17 DESIGN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Numerous grants, items and services have been provided to charities, organisations and individuals who meet the required criteria as set out in the charities incorporation document.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 December 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK ANDREW LEE BA HONSDIP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jonathan Paul Budd | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Heather Pattison | Trustee | 15 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE KAYE LEE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.54k | £17.00k | £21.07k | £22.89k | £22.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.16k | £15.78k | £22.46k | £23.16k | £22.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 DECEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH PRIORITY GIVEN TO PEOPLE WHO LIVE WITHIN THE WEST YORKSHIRE LOCALITY. 1) THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE IN NEED BR REASON OF AGE (YOUNG AND OLD) ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL OR OTHER SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO RELIEVE NEED, AND 2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING AND PROVIDING SUBSISTENCE TOWARDS THE TRAVEL COSTS OF SCHOOL TRIPS) OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O ONE 17 DESIGN
THE DYEHOUSE
ARMITAGE BRIDGE
HUDDERSFIELD
HD4 7PD
- Phone:
- 01484668000
- Email:
- carolinelee@one17design.com
- Website:
-
one17design.com/charity
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window