Financial history THE ROTARY CLUB OF SOLIHULL TRUST FUND

Charity number: 501333
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.43k £65 £2.51k £9.26k £5.91k
Total expenditure £12.59k £3.85k £2.52k £2.30k £3.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A